NY A09916 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-19 - substituted by s7741
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-19 - substituted by s7741
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates the bridge on state route 213 over Rondout creek in the town of Marbletown, county of Ulster, as the "Kathy Cairo Davis Memorial Bridge".
Title
Designates the bridge on state route 213 over Rondout creek in the town of Marbletown, county of Ulster, as the "Kathy Cairo Davis Memorial Bridge".
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-19 | Assembly | substituted by s7741 |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | rules report cal.338 |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | reported |
2018-06-07 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-06-05 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2018-02-22 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S07741 (Same As) 2018-10-02 - SIGNED CHAP.318