NY A10058 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-2)
Status: Vetoed on September 18 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-18 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 18 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-18 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
To protect taxi drivers from being assaulted on the job by increasing criminal penalties for such assaults and posting warnings in taxi cabs about such penalties.
Title
Enacts the "taxi driver protection act"; requires a sign in every for-hire vehicle that states that "WARNING: Assaulting A Taxi Driver Is Punishable By Up To Twenty-Five Years In Prison."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-18 | tabled | |
2010-09-18 | vetoed memo.6808 | |
2010-09-07 | delivered to governor | |
2010-06-25 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2010-06-25 | PASSED SENATE | |
2010-06-25 | 3RD READING CAL.1269 | |
2010-06-25 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7022B | |
2010-06-22 | REFERRED TO RULES | |
2010-06-22 | delivered to senate | |
2010-06-22 | passed assembly | |
2010-06-22 | ordered to third reading rules cal.253 | |
2010-06-22 | rules report cal.253 | |
2010-06-22 | reported | |
2010-06-18 | amend and recommit to rules 10058b | |
2010-06-14 | reported referred to rules | |
2010-06-09 | print number 10058a | |
2010-06-09 | amend (t) and recommit to codes | |
2010-03-01 | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S7022 (Same As) 2010-06-25 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10058B