NY A10100 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-09 - signed chap.308
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-09 - signed chap.308
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the lease of advertising space on sports field fences in the city of Rye, Westchester County.
Title
Authorizes the lease of advertising space on sports field fences in the city of Rye, Westchester County.
Sponsors
Asm. Steven Otis [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-09 | Senate | signed chap.308 |
2016-08-30 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2016-06-16 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-16 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-16 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1872 |
2016-06-16 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7602 |
2016-06-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2016-06-06 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2016-06-06 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-06-06 | Assembly | home rule request |
2016-05-26 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.862 |
2016-05-25 | Assembly | reported |
2016-05-24 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2016-05-10 | Assembly | referred to cities |
Same As/Similar To
S07602 (Same As) 2016-06-16 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10100