NY A10108 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-06 - substituted by s7197
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-06 - substituted by s7197
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to extending the authority of the department of environmental conservation to manage fish.
Title
Relates to extending the authority of the department of environmental conservation to manage fish.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-06 | Assembly | substituted by s7197 |
2016-05-26 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.863 |
2016-05-24 | Assembly | reported |
2016-05-11 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S07197 (Same As) 2016-07-21 - SIGNED CHAP.200