NY A10157 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-30 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-30 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to voting by members of the New York state authorities control board.
Title
Relates to voting by members of the New York state authorities control board.
Sponsors
Asm. Amy Paulin [D] | Asm. Steven Otis [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 139 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 139 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-30 | Assembly | tabled |
2022-12-30 | Assembly | vetoed memo.187 |
2022-12-19 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2022-05-18 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-18 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.698 |
2022-05-18 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7337 |
2022-05-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
2022-05-11 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-05-11 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-05-10 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.153 |
2022-05-10 | Assembly | rules report cal.153 |
2022-05-10 | Assembly | reported |
2022-05-09 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-05-04 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
Same As/Similar To
S07337 (Same As) 2022-05-18 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10157