NY A10172 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-20 - substituted by s8205
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-20 - substituted by s8205
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Adds lake Neatahwanta and the Oswego river to the definition of inland waterways.
Title
Adds lake Neatahwanta and the Oswego river to the definition of inland waterways.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 21 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 21 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Assembly | substituted by s8205 |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | rules report cal.452 |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | reported |
2018-06-05 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-05-08 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2018-03-22 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S08205 (Same As) 2018-12-28 - SIGNED CHAP.499