NY A10207 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-28 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-28 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the effectiveness of authorized sweepstakes with respect to subscriptions to "The Conservationist" until August 1, 2027.
Title
Extends the effectiveness of authorized sweepstakes with respect to subscriptions to "The Conservationist" until August 1, 2027.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-28 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2024-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2024-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-28 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-05-28 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2024-05-28 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1323 |
2024-05-28 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S9321 |
2024-05-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2024-05-20 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2024-05-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2024-05-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.86 |
2024-05-20 | Assembly | rules report cal.86 |
2024-05-20 | Assembly | reported |
2024-05-14 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2024-05-10 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S09321 (Same As) 2024-05-28 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10207