NY A10249 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on November 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-28 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on November 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-28 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the "charitable gaming act of 2016"; allows games known as "raffles" to accept legal tender, credit or debit card for payment; further authorizes "raffles" at the discretion of the games of chance licensee, to be purchased via the internet or mobile application with a credit or debit card upon the account holder's direct consent; makes related provisions.
Title
Enacts the "charitable gaming act of 2016"; allows games known as "raffles" to accept legal tender, credit or debit card for payment; further authorizes "raffles" at the discretion of the games of chance licensee, to be purchased via the internet or mobile application with a credit or debit card upon the account holder's direct consent; makes related provisions.
Sponsors
Asm. Robin Schimminger [D] | Asm. Gary Pretlow [D] | Asm. Stephen Hawley [R] | Asm. Anthony Brindisi [D] |
Asm. David DiPietro [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-28 | Senate | tabled |
2016-11-28 | Senate | vetoed memo.258 |
2016-11-16 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2016-06-17 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-17 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-17 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1972 |
2016-06-17 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7640A |
2016-06-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.414 |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | rules report cal.414 |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | reported |
2016-06-02 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2016-05-27 | Assembly | print number 10249a |
2016-05-27 | Assembly | amend and recommit to racing and wagering |
2016-05-18 | Assembly | referred to racing and wagering |
Same As/Similar To
S07640 (Same As) 2016-06-17 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10249A