NY S07640 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on May 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-17 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10249A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-17 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10249A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the "charitable gaming act of 2016"; allows games known as "raffles" to accept legal tender, credit or debit card for payment; further authorizes "raffles" at the discretion of the games of chance licensee, to be purchased via the internet or mobile application with a credit or debit card upon the account holder's direct consent; makes related provisions.
Title
Enacts the "charitable gaming act of 2016"; allows games known as "raffles" to accept legal tender, credit or debit card for payment; further authorizes "raffles" at the discretion of the games of chance licensee, to be purchased via the internet or mobile application with a credit or debit card upon the account holder's direct consent; makes related provisions.
Sponsors
Sen. Patrick Gallivan [R] | Sen. Rich Funke [R] | Sen. Joseph Griffo [R] | Sen. Timothy Kennedy [D] |
Sen. Robert Ortt [R] | Sen. Michael Ranzenhofer [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-17 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A10249A |
2016-06-17 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1972 |
2016-06-17 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2016-05-31 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7640A |
2016-05-31 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2016-05-24 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2016-05-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO RACING, GAMING AND WAGERING |
Same As/Similar To
A10249 (Same As) 2016-11-28 - tabled