NY A10261 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-9)
Status: Introduced on March 27 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-06 - reported referred to rules
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 27 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-06 - reported referred to rules
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the "online digital paperwork reduction act"; makes every state agency reports, digests and records available on their respective websites.
Title
Enacts the "online digital paperwork reduction act"; makes every state agency reports, digests and records available on their respective websites.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-06-05 | Assembly | print number 10261a |
2018-06-05 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to governmental operations |
2018-03-27 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S04149 (Same As) 2018-06-11 - referred to governmental operations