NY A10266 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-30 - signed chap.391
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-30 - signed chap.391
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to taxation of unincorporated businesses.
Title
Relates to taxation of unincorporated businesses.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-30 | Senate | signed chap.391 |
2016-09-20 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2016-06-16 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-16 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-16 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1915 |
2016-06-16 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8038 |
2016-06-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.148 |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | rules report cal.148 |
2016-06-07 | Assembly | reported |
2016-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2016-05-19 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S08038 (Same As) 2016-06-16 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10266