NY A10381 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-13 - substituted by s8217
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-13 - substituted by s8217
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the effectiveness of provisions relating to physical therapy assistants.
Title
Extends the effectiveness of provisions relating to physical therapy assistants.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-01 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Favorable (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-13 | Assembly | substituted by s8217 |
2018-05-14 | Assembly | amended on third reading 10381a |
2018-05-03 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.852 |
2018-05-01 | Assembly | reported |
2018-04-18 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
Same As/Similar To
S08217 (Same As) 2018-07-01 - SIGNED CHAP.107