NY A10606 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-25 - signed chap.76
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-25 - signed chap.76
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to compensation, benefits and other terms and conditions of employment of certain state officers and employees; makes an appropriation therefor.
Title
Relates to compensation, benefits and other terms and conditions of employment of certain state officers and employees; makes an appropriation therefor.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-25 | Senate | signed chap.76 |
2018-06-13 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2018-06-06 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-06 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-06-05 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1350 |
2018-06-05 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8498 |
2018-05-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2018-05-30 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-05-30 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-05-30 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.33 |
2018-05-30 | Assembly | rules report cal.33 |
2018-05-30 | Assembly | reported |
2018-05-30 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-05-30 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2018-05-08 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S08498 (Same As) 2018-06-05 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10606