NY A10673 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-19 - substituted by s8648
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-19 - substituted by s8648
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases to the ability of the New York state medical care facilities finance agency to issue certain bonds and notes.
Title
Increases to the ability of the New York state medical care facilities finance agency to issue certain bonds and notes.
Sponsors
Asm. Amy Paulin [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-19 | Assembly | substituted by s8648 |
2018-05-24 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.969 |
2018-05-22 | Assembly | reported |
2018-05-14 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2018-05-10 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
Same As/Similar To
S08648 (Same As) 2018-07-31 - SIGNED CHAP.183