NY S08648 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-31 - SIGNED CHAP.183
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-31 - SIGNED CHAP.183
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the ability of the New York state medical care facilities finance agency to issue certain bonds and notes.
Title
Relates to the ability of the New York state medical care facilities finance agency to issue certain bonds and notes.
Sponsors
Sen. Kemp Hannon [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 136 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-31 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.183 |
2018-07-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.969 |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | substituted for a10673 |
2018-06-12 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2018-06-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-12 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-06-05 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-06-04 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-05-31 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1507 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A10673 (Same As) 2018-06-19 - substituted by s8648