NY A10713 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 23 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-23 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on July 23 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-23 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes Tioga county to impose an additional surcharge to pay for the costs associated with updating the services needed to provide an enhanced 911 emergency telephone system; authorizes an additional surcharge at the rate of one dollar per month.
Title
Authorizes Tioga county to impose an additional surcharge to pay for the costs associated with updating the services needed to provide an enhanced 911 emergency telephone system; authorizes an additional surcharge at the rate of one dollar per month.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 121 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 27 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 27 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | home rule request |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.339 |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | rules report cal.339 |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | reported |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | reference changed to ways and means |
2020-07-14 | Assembly | print number 10713a |
2020-07-14 | Assembly | amend and recommit to local governments |
2020-07-01 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S07618 (Same As) 2020-07-14 - PRINT NUMBER 7618A