NY A10753 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-20 - substituted by s7054
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-20 - substituted by s7054
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Validates certain acts of the Hendrick Hudson central school district with regard to two capital improvement projects and provides for payment of state aid for such projects.
Title
Validates certain acts of the Hendrick Hudson central school district with regard to two capital improvement projects and provides for payment of state aid for such projects.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Assembly | substituted by s7054 |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.375 |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | rules report cal.375 |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | reported |
2018-06-11 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2018-05-16 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S07054 (Same As) 2018-11-05 - APPROVAL MEMO.3