NY A11021 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 31 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-20 - substituted by s6634
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 31 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-20 - substituted by s6634
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the state commissioner of transportation to convey certain real property to the town of Huntington, county of Suffolk.
Title
Authorizes the state commissioner of transportation to convey certain real property to the town of Huntington, county of Suffolk.
Sponsors
Asm. Steve Stern [D] | Asm. Andrew Raia [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Assembly | substituted by s6634 |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.426 |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | rules report cal.426 |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | reported |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | reference changed to ways and means |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S06634 (Same As) 2018-12-21 - SIGNED CHAP.431