NY A11039 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on May 31 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-20 - substituted by s8596
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 31 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-20 - substituted by s8596
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Albany Pine Bush commission to acquire real property as may be necessary for the purposes and functions of the commission.
Title
Authorizes the Albany Pine Bush commission to acquire real property as may be necessary for the purposes and functions of the commission.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Assembly | substituted by s8596 |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.391 |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | rules report cal.391 |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | reported |
2018-06-11 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-06-05 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S08596 (Same As) 2018-12-21 - SIGNED CHAP.449