NY S08596 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-21 - SIGNED CHAP.449
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes the Albany Pine Bush commission to acquire real property as may be necessary for the purposes and functions of the commission.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes the Albany Pine Bush commission to acquire real property as may be necessary for the purposes and functions of the commission.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-21AssemblySIGNED CHAP.449
2018-12-12SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2018-06-20Assemblyreturned to senate
2018-06-20Assemblypassed assembly
2018-06-20Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.391
2018-06-20Assemblysubstituted for a11039
2018-06-06Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2018-06-06SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-06SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-06SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1612
2018-06-05SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2018-05-10SenateREFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION

Same As/Similar To

A11039 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - substituted by s8596

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback