NY A11046 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-18 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-18 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the smart schools review board to meet at minimum once every three months and to further announce the date for a subsequent meeting.
Title
Requires the smart schools review board to meet at minimum once every three months and to further announce the date for a subsequent meeting.
Sponsors
Asm. Catherine Nolan [D] | Asm. D. Billy Jones [D] | Asm. Steve Stern [D] | Asm. Robert Rodriguez [D] |
Asm. Doug Smith [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-06-13 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.207 |
2018-06-13 | Assembly | rules report cal.207 |
2018-06-13 | Assembly | reported |
2018-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S09115 (Same As) 2018-06-19 - REFERRED TO RULES