NY A11068 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on June 4 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-20 - substituted by s8878
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to certain examinations taken by funeral directors.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to certain examinations taken by funeral directors.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-20Assemblysubstituted by s8878
2018-06-20Assemblyrules report cal.462
2018-06-20Assemblyreported
2018-06-18Assemblyreported referred to rules
2018-06-04Assemblyreferred to health

Same As/Similar To

S08878 (Same As) 2018-09-07 - SIGNED CHAP.270

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback