NY A11203 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Vetoed on December 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-28 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to clarifying alcoholic beverage tastings sales tax exemptions; establishes requirements for such tastings including number of samples offered.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to clarifying alcoholic beverage tastings sales tax exemptions; establishes requirements for such tastings including number of samples offered.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-28Senatetabled
2018-12-28Senatevetoed memo.350
2018-12-17Assemblydelivered to governor
2018-06-20SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-20SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-20Senate3RD READING CAL.2077
2018-06-20SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S9040
2018-06-19SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2018-06-19Assemblydelivered to senate
2018-06-19Assemblypassed assembly
2018-06-18Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.294
2018-06-18Assemblyrules report cal.294
2018-06-18Assemblyreported
2018-06-18Assemblyreported referred to rules
2018-06-14Assemblyreferred to ways and means

Same As/Similar To

S09040 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A11203

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A11203&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A11203&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A11203
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A11203&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A11203&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A11203&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/A11203#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback