NY A42012 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on December 10 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-12-10 - signed chap.560
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on December 10 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-12-10 - signed chap.560
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Updates the state energy conservation construction code to address the requirements of the American Recovery and Reinvestment Act of 2009.
Title
Updates the state energy conservation construction code to address the requirements of the American Recovery and Reinvestment Act of 2009.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-11-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 129 N: 1 NV: 19 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-12-10 | signed chap.560 | |
2010-12-07 | delivered to governor | |
2010-12-07 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2010-12-07 | PASSED SENATE | |
2010-12-07 | 3RD READING CAL.8 | |
2010-12-07 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S68012 | |
2010-11-30 | REFERRED TO RULES | |
2010-11-30 | delivered to senate | |
2010-11-30 | passed assembly | |
2010-11-30 | message of necessity - 3 day message | |
2010-11-29 | ordered to third reading rules cal.7 | |
2010-11-29 | rules report cal.7 | |
2010-11-29 | reported | |
2010-11-29 | reported referred to rules | |
2010-11-29 | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S08281 (Same As) 2010-06-24 - referred to energy
A07735 (Same As) 2010-06-24 - reported referred to rules
S68012 (Same As) 2010-12-07 - SUBSTITUTED BY A42012
A07735 (Same As) 2010-06-24 - reported referred to rules
S68012 (Same As) 2010-12-07 - SUBSTITUTED BY A42012