NY S08281 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 24 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-24 - referred to energy
Pending: Assembly Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 24 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-24 - referred to energy
Pending: Assembly Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Updates the state energy conservation construction code to address the requirements of the American Recovery and Reinvestment Act of 2009.
Title
Updates the state energy conservation construction code to address the requirements of the American Recovery and Reinvestment Act of 2009.
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Foley [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-06-24 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-24 | referred to energy | |
2010-06-24 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2010-06-24 | PASSED SENATE | |
2010-06-23 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1175 | |
2010-06-20 | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A07735 (Same As) 2010-06-24 - reported referred to rules
A42012 (Same As) 2010-12-10 - signed chap.560
S68012 (Same As) 2010-12-07 - SUBSTITUTED BY A42012
A42012 (Same As) 2010-12-10 - signed chap.560
S68012 (Same As) 2010-12-07 - SUBSTITUTED BY A42012