NY S00026 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires that any disposition of land or buildings by the New York City Housing Authority be subject to and comply with the provisions of New York City's Uniform Land Use Review Procedure.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires that any disposition of land or buildings by the New York City Housing Authority be subject to and comply with the provisions of New York City's Uniform Land Use Review Procedure.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-14SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-03-13Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-03-12Senate1ST REPORT CAL.260
2019-01-09SenateREFERRED TO CITIES

Same As/Similar To

A04131 (Same As) 2019-02-01 - referred to housing

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback