NY S00031 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-06 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-06 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires organizations that receive funds for capital improvements by the New York state dormitory authority and the urban development corporation to use such funds for the purchase of energy star equipment and appliances where available; defines energy star.
Title
Requires organizations that receive funds for capital improvements by the New York state dormitory authority and the urban development corporation to use such funds for the purchase of energy star equipment and appliances where available; defines energy star.
Sponsors
Sen. Brad Hoylman-Sigal [D] | Sen. John Brooks [D] | Sen. Anna Kaplan [D] | Sen. Jen Metzger [D] |
Sen. Luis Sepulveda [D] | Sen. Jose Serrano [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-06 | Senate | tabled |
2019-12-06 | Senate | vetoed memo.174 |
2019-11-26 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.1806 |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S31 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-18 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-06-18 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-14 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.277 |
2019-06-14 | Senate | rules report cal.277 |
2019-06-14 | Senate | reported |
2019-06-11 | Senate | reported referred to rules |
2019-04-30 | Senate | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-03-12 | Senate | referred to energy |
2019-06-20 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A6599 |
2019-06-20 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1806 |
2019-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-02-04 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2019-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A06599 (Same As) 2019-12-06 - tabled