NY S00064 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on October 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-04 - SIGNED CHAP.430
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on October 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-04 - SIGNED CHAP.430
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a statewide restaurant meals program as part of the supplemental nutrition assistance program.
Title
Establishes a statewide restaurant meals program as part of the supplemental nutrition assistance program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 112 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate Social Services Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate Social Services Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-04 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.430 |
2021-09-28 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-05-10 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.292 |
2021-05-10 | Assembly | substituted for a1524 |
2021-05-04 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2021-05-04 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-05-04 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-03-01 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-02-24 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-02-23 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.400 |
2021-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO SOCIAL SERVICES |
Same As/Similar To
A01524 (Same As) 2021-05-10 - substituted by s64