NY S00076 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-01-28 - PRINT NUMBER 76A
Pending: Senate Children and Families Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-01-28 - PRINT NUMBER 76A
Pending: Senate Children and Families Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires child protective service to report findings regarding children allegedly abused or neglected within fourteen days where ordered or requested by court to investigate, unless just cause can be shown to extend such time to twenty-one days.
Title
Requires child protective service to report findings regarding children allegedly abused or neglected within fourteen days where ordered or requested by court to investigate, unless just cause can be shown to extend such time to twenty-one days.
Sponsors
Sen. Dale Volker [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-28 | PRINT NUMBER 76A | |
2010-01-28 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES | |
2010-01-20 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES | |
2010-01-06 | REFERRED TO SOCIAL SERVICES, CHILDREN AND FAMILIES | |
2009-01-16 | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES | |
2009-01-07 | REFERRED TO SOCIAL SERVICES, CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |