NY S00089 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-06 - SIGNED CHAP.206
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-06 - SIGNED CHAP.206
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the crimes of making a threat of mass harm and aggravated threat of mass harm.
Title
Establishes the crimes of making a threat of mass harm and aggravated threat of mass harm.
Sponsors
Sen. Todd Kaminsky [D] | Sen. John Brooks [D] | Sen. Samra Brouk [D] | Sen. James Gaughran [D] |
Sen. Anna Kaplan [D] | Sen. Timothy Kennedy [D] | Sen. John Liu [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-02 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-06 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.206 |
2022-06-03 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.608 |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | substituted for a6716a |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2022-06-02 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-06-02 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-06-02 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1845 |
2022-06-02 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-05-30 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 89B |
2022-05-30 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CODES |
2022-05-29 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 89A |
2022-05-29 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CODES |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2021-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A06716 (Same As) 2022-06-02 - substituted by s89b