NY A06716 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-0)
Status: Introduced on March 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-02 - substituted by s89b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-02 - substituted by s89b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the crimes of making a threat of mass harm and aggravated threat of mass harm.
Title
Establishes the crimes of making a threat of mass harm and aggravated threat of mass harm.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-02 | Assembly | substituted by s89b |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | rules report cal.608 |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | reported |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-05-30 | Assembly | print number 6716a |
2022-05-30 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2021-03-26 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S00089 (Same As) 2022-06-06 - SIGNED CHAP.206