NY S00101 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Passed on July 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-31 - SIGNED CHAP.138
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Limits an educational institution's ability to authorize the possession of a weapon on school grounds to certain officers or agents of a law enforcement agency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Limits an educational institution's ability to authorize the possession of a weapon on school grounds to certain officers or agents of a law enforcement agency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 104 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-31AssemblySIGNED CHAP.138
2019-07-30SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2019-01-29Assemblyreturned to senate
2019-01-29Assemblypassed assembly
2019-01-29Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.18
2019-01-29Assemblysubstituted for a1715a
2019-01-29Assemblyreferred to codes
2019-01-29SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-01-29SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-01-28SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.81
2019-01-28SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2019-01-24SenatePRINT NUMBER 101A
2019-01-24SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CODES
2019-01-09SenateREFERRED TO CODES

Same As/Similar To

A01715 (Same As) 2019-01-29 - substituted by s101a

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S00101&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S00101&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S00101
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S00101&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S00101A
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/S101#SC1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/S101#SC2
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/S101#SF1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S00101&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1

Bill Comments

feedback