NY A01715 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Passed on July 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-31 - SIGNED CHAP.138
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Passed on July 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-31 - SIGNED CHAP.138
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Limits an educational institution's ability to authorize the possession of a weapon on school grounds to certain officers or agents of a law enforcement agency.
Title
Limits an educational institution's ability to authorize the possession of a weapon on school grounds to certain officers or agents of a law enforcement agency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-31 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.138 |
2019-07-30 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-01-29 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-01-29 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-01-29 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.18 |
2019-01-29 | Senate | substituted for a1715a |
2019-01-29 | Senate | referred to codes |
2019-01-29 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-01-29 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-01-28 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.81 |
2019-01-28 | Assembly | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-01-24 | Assembly | PRINT NUMBER 101A |
2019-01-24 | Assembly | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CODES |
2019-01-09 | Assembly | REFERRED TO CODES |
2019-01-29 | Assembly | substituted by s101a |
2019-01-28 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.18 |
2019-01-28 | Assembly | rules report cal.18 |
2019-01-28 | Assembly | reported |
2019-01-28 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-01-24 | Assembly | print number 1715a |
2019-01-24 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2019-01-16 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S00101 (Same As) 2019-07-31 - SIGNED CHAP.138