NY S00126 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-06 - referred to correction
Pending: Assembly Correction Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-06 - referred to correction
Pending: Assembly Correction Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the education and experience of members of the state board of parole; provides that members can have either a degree and at least five years of experience in several fields or at least ten years of experience in such fields.
Title
Relates to the education and experience of members of the state board of parole; provides that members can have either a degree and at least five years of experience in several fields or at least ten years of experience in such fields.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-08 - Senate - Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-08 - Senate - Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-06 | Assembly | referred to correction |
2024-03-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-03-06 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2024-02-12 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-02-07 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-02-06 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.362 |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2023-03-15 | Assembly | referred to correction |
2023-03-15 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-03-15 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-03-13 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2023-03-09 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2023-03-08 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.452 |
2023-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A00586 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - referred to correction