NY S00186 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-6)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Enacts "Kirby and Quigley's Law"; expands the definition of aggravated cruelty to animals to include harm to a companion animal during the commission of a felony.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enacts "Kirby and Quigley's Law"; expands the definition of aggravated cruelty to animals to include harm to a companion animal during the commission of a felony.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20SenateCOMMITTED TO RULES
2019-05-30SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-05-29Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-05-22Senate1ST REPORT CAL.889
2019-02-11SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO DOMESTIC ANIMAL WELFARE
2019-01-09SenateREFERRED TO AGRICULTURE

Same As/Similar To

A01834 (Same As) 2019-01-17 - referred to agriculture

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback