NY S00208 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-05-30 - SUBSTITUTED BY A1371A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-05-30 - SUBSTITUTED BY A1371A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes that state agencies or authorities shall implement gender-neutral terminology on state websites.
Title
Establishes that state agencies or authorities shall implement gender-neutral terminology on state websites.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - Senate - Senate Internet and Technology Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - Senate - Senate Internet and Technology Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-30 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A1371A |
2023-05-22 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 208A |
2023-05-22 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2023-05-22 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2023-05-22 | Senate | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY |
2023-03-27 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2023-03-27 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-03-27 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-03-08 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2023-03-01 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2023-02-28 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.430 |
2023-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO INTERNET AND TECHNOLOGY |
Same As/Similar To
A01371 (Same As) 2023-06-25 - approval memo.4