NY A01371 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - approval memo.4
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - approval memo.4
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes that state agencies or authorities shall implement gender-neutral terminology on state websites.
Title
Establishes that state agencies or authorities shall implement gender-neutral terminology on state websites.
Sponsors
Asm. Linda Rosenthal [D] | Asm. Chantel Jackson [D] | Asm. Rodneyse Bichotte Hermelyn [D] | Asm. Nader Sayegh [D] |
Asm. Jo Simon [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-25 | Assembly | approval memo.4 |
2023-06-25 | Assembly | signed chap.140 |
2023-06-23 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2023-05-30 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-05-30 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-05-30 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.430 |
2023-05-30 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S208A |
2023-05-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2023-05-15 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2023-05-15 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2023-05-11 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.194 |
2023-05-09 | Assembly | reported |
2023-05-02 | Assembly | print number 1371a |
2023-05-02 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental operations |
2023-01-17 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S00208 (Same As) 2023-05-30 - SUBSTITUTED BY A1371A