NY S00237 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION
Pending: Senate Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION
Pending: Senate Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to returnable bottles; adds wine, liquor, distilled spirit coolers, and cider and wine products to the definition of "beverage"; provides that the handling fee will be six cents for each beverage container accepted by a deposit initiator from a dealer or operator of a redemption center, and that the deposit and redemption amount will be ten cents.
Title
Relates to returnable bottles; adds wine, liquor, distilled spirit coolers, and cider and wine products to the definition of "beverage"; provides that the handling fee will be six cents for each beverage container accepted by a deposit initiator from a dealer or operator of a redemption center, and that the deposit and redemption amount will be ten cents.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-14 - Senate - Senate Environmental Conservation Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2023-06-01 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 237B |
2023-06-01 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2023-05-24 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 237A |
2023-05-24 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2023-03-15 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2023-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
Same As/Similar To
A06353 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - referred to environmental conservation