NY S00259 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires cultural awareness and competence training for medical professionals, including two hours of course work or training encompassing minority healthcare issues; provides an exemption for certain individuals; requires hospitals and facilities to request documentation of the completion of training from employees and prospective employees.
Title
Requires cultural awareness and competence training for medical professionals, including two hours of course work or training encompassing minority healthcare issues; provides an exemption for certain individuals; requires hospitals and facilities to request documentation of the completion of training from employees and prospective employees.
Sponsors
Sen. Jose Serrano [D] | Sen. Jamaal Bailey [D] | Sen. Iwen Chu [D] | Sen. Brad Hoylman-Sigal [D] |
Sen. Robert Jackson [D] | Sen. Timothy Kennedy [D] | Sen. Liz Krueger [D] | Sen. Rachel May [D] |
Sen. Gustavo Rivera [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - Senate - Senate Higher Education Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - Senate - Senate Higher Education Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2023-03-22 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
2023-03-22 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-03-22 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-03-20 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2023-03-16 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2023-03-15 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.512 |
2023-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A00548 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - referred to higher education