NY S00338 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to increasing the volunteer firefighters' and ambulance workers' credit; increases the amount of the credit from $200 to $500 for single filers who have served for less than five years and from $200 to $1,000 for single filers who serve at least five years and from $400 to $1,000 for spouses filing jointly where one spouse has served less than five years and from $400 to $2,000 for spouses filing jointly who have each served at least five years.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to increasing the volunteer firefighters' and ambulance workers' credit; increases the amount of the credit from $200 to $500 for single filers who have served for less than five years and from $200 to $1,000 for single filers who serve at least five years and from $400 to $1,000 for spouses filing jointly where one spouse has served less than five years and from $400 to $2,000 for spouses filing jointly who have each served at least five years.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-30SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
2019-03-11SenateNOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - REQUESTED
2019-01-09SenateREFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS

Same As/Similar To

A04573 (Same As) 2019-02-04 - referred to ways and means

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback