NY S00379 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-04 - REFERRED TO HEALTH
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-04 - REFERRED TO HEALTH
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to a medical assistance information and payment system; directs the department of health to issue a request for proposal for the purpose of providing the system within 90 days.
Title
Relates to a medical assistance information and payment system; directs the department of health to issue a request for proposal for the purpose of providing the system within 90 days.
Sponsors
Sen. Kemp Hannon [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-06-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2011-06-15 | Assembly | referred to health |
2011-06-15 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2011-06-15 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2011-02-07 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2011-02-01 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2011-01-31 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.41 |
2011-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A00961 (Same As) 2011-05-11 - enacting clause stricken