NY S00474 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on December 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-10 - approval memo.36
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on December 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-10 - approval memo.36
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to central venous lines; requires hospitals upon discharge of a patient who has a condition that requires a central venous line after discharge, to consult with the designated caregiver to determine his or her capabilities and limitations.
Title
Relates to central venous lines; requires hospitals upon discharge of a patient who has a condition that requires a central venous line after discharge, to consult with the designated caregiver to determine his or her capabilities and limitations.
Sponsors
Sen. David Carlucci [D] | Sen. Brad Hoylman-Sigal [D] | Sen. Shelley Mayer [D] | Sen. Roxanne Persaud [D] |
Sen. Diane Savino [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-10 | Senate | approval memo.36 |
2019-12-10 | Senate | signed chap.617 |
2019-12-06 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-05-06 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-06 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-06 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.453 |
2019-05-06 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S474 |
2019-01-23 | Assembly | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2019-01-23 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-01-23 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-01-17 | Senate | advanced to third reading cal.3 |
2019-01-15 | Senate | reported |
2019-01-09 | Senate | referred to health |
2019-05-06 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A212 |
2019-04-29 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-04-10 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.453 |
2019-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A00212 (Same As) 2019-12-10 - approval memo.36