NY S00489 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 5 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS
Pending: Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 5 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS
Pending: Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a comprehensive electric vehicle fast charging station implementation plan; requires the New York state energy and research development authority to further establish a "Fast Charge NY working group" to develop such plan; makes related provisions.
Title
Establishes a comprehensive electric vehicle fast charging station implementation plan; requires the New York state energy and research development authority to further establish a "Fast Charge NY working group" to develop such plan; makes related provisions.
Sponsors
Sen. Leroy Comrie [D] | Sen. Iwen Chu [D] | Sen. Rachel May [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - Senate - Senate Energy And Telecommunications Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - Senate - Senate Energy And Telecommunications Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2023-06-05 | Assembly | referred to energy |
2023-06-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-06-05 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-03-08 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2023-03-08 | Senate | AMENDED 489A |
2023-03-01 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2023-02-28 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.424 |
2023-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A08869 (Same As) 2024-03-28 - advanced to third reading cal.385