NY S00504 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-04 - REFERRED TO INSURANCE
Pending: Senate Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-04 - REFERRED TO INSURANCE
Pending: Senate Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits insurers from using retained asset accounts to hold proceeds from death benefits.
Title
Prohibits insurers from using retained asset accounts to hold proceeds from death benefits.
Sponsors
Sen. Ruben Diaz [D] | Sen. Liz Krueger [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
2011-04-04 | Senate | DEFEATED IN INSURANCE |
2011-02-22 | Senate | NOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - REQUESTED |
2011-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A00683 (Same As) 2012-01-04 - referred to insurance