NY S00532 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-13 - referred to consumer affairs and protection
Pending: Assembly Consumer Affairs and Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-13 - referred to consumer affairs and protection
Pending: Assembly Consumer Affairs and Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the penalties for bias related and gang related graffiti, and graffiti upon religious property.
Title
Increases the penalties for bias related and gang related graffiti, and graffiti upon religious property.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-13 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
2012-06-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-06-13 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-06-13 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1165 |
2012-06-13 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2012-05-21 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO CODES |
2012-04-25 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 532B |
2012-04-25 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2011-06-13 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 532A |
2011-06-13 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2011-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A06648 (Same As) 2012-04-26 - print number 6648b