NY S00561 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the commissioner of taxation and finance, when using external indices to determine sales and compensating use tax due because of failure to file a return or filing of an incorrect return, to use external indices which reflect local economic conditions.
Title
Requires the commissioner of taxation and finance, when using external indices to determine sales and compensating use tax due because of failure to file a return or filing of an incorrect return, to use external indices which reflect local economic conditions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-15 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - Senate - Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - Senate - Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - Senate - Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - Senate - Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-05-22 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-05-16 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-05-15 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1217 |
2018-01-23 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-02-13 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2017-02-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-02-13 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-02-07 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-02-06 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-01-31 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.142 |
2017-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A03924 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to ways and means