NY S00745 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-02 - PRINT NUMBER 745A
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-02 - PRINT NUMBER 745A
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for establishment of the urban open space program in the office of parks, recreation and historic preservation; establishes the urban open space program fund; makes an appropriation of 10 million dollars; the purpose of the program is to provide for the acquisition, creation, establishment, expansion, improvement, conservation and protection of open space areas in cities for the purpose of enhancing the urban environment, and thereby promoting the health, safety and welfare of the people of the state in a variety of ways, such as reduction of air and noise pollution, modification of extremes of temperature (resulting in the reduction of energy expended to heat/cool buildings/homes), assisting watershed management, providing habitats for desirable urban vegetation and wildlife, provision of shade, preservation of natural resources, enhancement of real estate values and beautification of urban areas throughout the state.
Title
Provides for establishment of the urban open space program in the office of parks, recreation and historic preservation; establishes the urban open space program fund; makes an appropriation of 10 million dollars; the purpose of the program is to provide for the acquisition, creation, establishment, expansion, improvement, conservation and protection of open space areas in cities for the purpose of enhancing the urban environment, and thereby promoting the health, safety and welfare of the people of the state in a variety of ways, such as reduction of air and noise pollution, modification of extremes of temperature (resulting in the reduction of energy expended to heat/cool buildings/homes), assisting watershed management, providing habitats for desirable urban vegetation and wildlife, provision of shade, preservation of natural resources, enhancement of real estate values and beautification of urban areas throughout the state.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-02 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 745A |
2016-02-02 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2015-01-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A00559 (Same As) 2016-06-06 - held for consideration in tourism, parks, arts and sports development