NY S00849 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to renaming the bridges of the state highway system after New York state's medal of honor recipients.
Title
Relates to renaming the bridges of the state highway system after New York state's medal of honor recipients.
Sponsors
Sen. Patricia Ritchie [R] | Sen. Philip Boyle [R] | Sen. Thomas Croci [R] | Sen. John DeFrancisco [R] |
Sen. Patrick Gallivan [R] | Sen. William Larkin [R] | Sen. Kathleen Marchione [R] | Sen. Robert Ortt [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-02-13 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-02-12 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.416 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2017-06-15 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-15 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-14 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1688 |
2017-06-06 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A03413 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to transportation