NY S00891 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-26 - SUBSTITUTED BY A956
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-26 - SUBSTITUTED BY A956
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to certificate of authority numbers for alcohol vendors.
Title
Relates to certificate of authority numbers for alcohol vendors.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-26 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A956 |
2021-01-11 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.44 |
2021-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A00956 (Same As) 2021-01-28 - signed chap.3