NY S00982 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 22 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-22 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on July 22 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-22 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that every banking institution which maintains checking accounts for customers shall pay checks in the order received within account balance; provides such banks may dishonor check for insufficient funds, but then must honor smaller checks within amounts on deposit in the subject account.
Title
Provides that every banking institution which maintains checking accounts for customers shall pay checks in the order received within account balance; provides such banks may dishonor check for insufficient funds, but then must honor smaller checks within amounts on deposit in the subject account.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-22 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2020-07-22 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-22 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-07-22 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.971 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO BANKS |
2019-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO BANKS |
Same As/Similar To
A01931 (Same As) 2020-01-21 - enacting clause stricken
A09677 (Same As) 2020-07-21 - ordered to third reading rules cal.251
A09677 (Same As) 2020-07-21 - ordered to third reading rules cal.251